Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Pedro da Cunha Cintra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1906BornPiracaia
26 Oct 193023.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 194841.1AppointedBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
28 Mar 194841.3Ordained BishopBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Feb 198477.2RetiredBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Mar 199992.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Pedro da Cunha Cintra:
Bishop Manuel Pedro da Cunha Cintra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Petrópolis

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015