Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Benedito Simão

Deceased

Bishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1951Born
7 Jun 198130.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
28 Nov 200150.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
28 Nov 200150.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagaria
25 Jan 200251.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagaria
9 Mar 200251.1InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
24 Jun 200958.4AppointedBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Nov 201564.9DiedBishop of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Benedito Simão
Bishop José Benedito Simão (born , died ) Bishop of Assis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaçapava

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,122
  • d: CB, 27 Nov 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast