Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaldo Carvalheiro Neto

Bishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1967 Born
17 May 199730.0Ordained PriestPriest of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 May 201649.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Jul 201649.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Oct 201649.5SucceededBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Arnaldo Carvalheiro Neto
Bishop Arnaldo Carvalheiro Neto (born ) Bishop of Itapeva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Auxiliadora, Araçatuba, Diocese of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itapeva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2016
  • ob: CB, 9 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 15 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,062
  • s: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Feb 2017