Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salomão Barbosa Ferraz

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Eleutherna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1880Born
18 Jul 194565.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 194565.4Ordained BishopBishop
1963²82.8Converted
10 May 196383.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutherna
11 May 196989.2DiedTitular Bishop of Eleutherna

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salomão Barbosa Ferraz
Bishop Salomão Barbosa Ferraz (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Eleutherna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaú, Brazil
Death PlaceSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo, Brazil

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 29 Sep 2017