Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cuiabá

Archidioecesis Cuiabensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mílton Antônio dos Santos, S.D.B., Archbishop
  • Bonifácio Piccinini, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 March 1910
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Mato Grosso
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 24,542 (9,479 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Oeste II
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, C.P. 22, Praca do Seminario 489, 78005-970 Cuiaba, MT, Brazil
  • Telephone: (065)3321-3631
  • Fax: 3623-1302

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Cuiabá
6 December 1745ErectedDiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro Territorial Prelature of Cuiabá (erected)
Diocese of Cuiabá
15 July 1826ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Cuiabá Diocese of Cuiabá
10 March 1910Territory LostDiocese of Cuiabá Diocese of Corumbá (erected)
Archdiocese of Cuiabá
10 March 1910ElevatedDiocese of Cuiabá Archdiocese of Cuiabá
5 April 1910Territory LostArchdiocese of Cuiabá Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres (erected)
12 May 1914Territory LostArchdiocese of Cuiabá Territorial Prelature of Registro do Araguaia (erected)
22 March 1929Territory LostArchdiocese of Cuiabá Territorial Prelature of Diamantino (erected)
13 July 1940Territory LostArchdiocese of Cuiabá Territorial Prelature of Chapada (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Cuiabá
194984,50085,00099.4%23233,673153511ap1951
1966148,000160,00092.5%326295,103488512ap1967
1970185,000200,00092.5%226286,6073511212ap1971
1976210,000220,00095.5%629356,0003412216ap1977
1980114,000126,00090.5%531363,1663811517ap1981
1990385,000434,00088.7%736438,9534613121ap1991
1999800,000900,00088.9%13385115,6865713622ap2000
2000800,000920,00087.0%18395714,0355613523ap2001
2001680,000766,72788.7%21416210,9675613523ap2002
2002700,000800,00087.5%22396111,4757312022ap2003
2003700,000796,57287.9%24406410,9376912622ap2004
2004700,000809,63186.5%26386410,9376312122ap2005
2006724,166851,96185.0%3241739,9205711023ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013