Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Curitiba

Archidioecesis Curitibensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 May 1926
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 5,571 (2,151 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul 2
  • Official Web Site: https://arquidiocesedecuritiba.org.br
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Av. Jaime Reis 369, 80510-010 Curitiba, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (041)2105-6302; 2105-6321

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Curitiba
27 April 1892ErectedDiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Curitiba (erected)
19 March 1908Territory LostDiocese of Curitiba Diocese of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina) (erected)
10 May 1926Territory LostDiocese of Curitiba Territorial Prelature of Foz do Iguaçu (Iguassú) (erected)
Diocese of Jacarezinho (erected)
Diocese of Ponta Grossa (erected)
Archdiocese of Curitiba
10 May 1926ElevatedDiocese of Curitiba Archdiocese of Curitiba
21 July 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Curitiba (Paraíiaguá, Antonina, Adrianople, Bocaiuva do Sul, Campina Grande do Sul, Cerro Azul, Guaraqueçaba, Guaratuba, and Morretes) Diocese of Paranaguá (erected)
3 December 1976Territory LostArchdiocese of Curitiba (Sao Mateus, Sao Joao do Triunfo, and Antonio Olinto)
Diocese of Guarapuava (Cruz Machado)
Diocese of Ponta Grossa (União da Vitoria, Porto Vitoria Paulo Freitas, Paulo Frontim, Mallet, Rio Azul, and Rebouças)
Diocese of União da Vitória (erected)
6 December 2006Territory LostArchdiocese of Curitiba (São José dos Pinhais, Agudos do Sul, Araucária, Campo do Tenente, Contenda, Fazenda Rio Grande, Lapa, Mandirituba, Piên, Piraquara, Quatro Barras, Quirandinha, Rio Negro, and Tijucas do Sul) Diocese of São José dos Pinhais (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Curitiba
1949480,000500,00096.0%241371612,98122455039ap1951
1966650,000700,00092.9%391842232,9142211,06067ap1967
1968800,0001,000,00080.0%532002533,1622501,08976ap1971
19761,100,0001,250,00088.0%622923543,1076411,080106ap1977
19801,187,0001,270,00093.5%585820,4653891,167110ap1981
19901,855,0002,246,00082.6%743274014,62537591,229131ap1991
19992,194,0002,656,00082.6%913414325,078319061,123146ap2000
20002,000,0002,700,00074.1%1023404424,524357911,168150ap2001
20012,000,0002,770,03472.2%1013464474,474378601,103151ap2002
20022,000,0002,771,65172.2%1013404414,535409301,111151ap2003
20032,000,0002,771,73172.2%993404394,555617951,076155ap2004
20042,000,0002,771,73172.2%1013504514,434708791,177154ap2005
20061,480,0462,262,34765.4%923344263,474677211,025129ap2007
20131,821,0002,444,00074.5%993064054,49664618931137ap2014
20161,866,0002,605,00071.6%983104084,57387613914134ap2017
20191,700,7002,633,47964.6%1054005053,367124600878142ap2020
20211,727,6702,675,37064.6%2104116212,782136596870143ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 28 Feb 2024