Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Bini, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1930Born
8 Dec 195929.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Mar 198453.7AppointedBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 May 198453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jun 198454.0InstalledBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Jun 198757.0DiedBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Walter Bini
Bishop Walter Bini S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Lins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Ordained BishopSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast