Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tarcísio Scaramussa, S.D.B.

Coadjutor Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1950 BornProsperidade
31 Jan 196918.4ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jan 197726.3Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Dec 197727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Jan 200857.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
23 Jan 200857.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Segia
19 Apr 200857.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segia
16 Jul 201463.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tarcísio Scaramussa:
Bishop Tarcísio Scaramussa S.D.B. (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Santos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,728
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014