Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Latin (or Roman) Bishop Antônio de Castro Mayer] †

Society of St. Pius X

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1904Born
30 Oct 192723.3Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
6 Mar 194843.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
6 Mar 194843.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Priene
23 May 194843.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Priene
3 Jan 194944.5SucceededBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
29 Aug 198177.1ResignedBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
26 Apr 199186.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Castro Mayer (VIAF: 118556528)
Bishop Antônio de Castro Mayer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampinas, Diocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 48
  • s: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast