Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
4 July 1924 | Erected | Archdiocese of São Paulo | Diocese of Santos (erected) |
14 February 1958 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Santos (Ubatuba and Caraguatatuba) | Diocese of Taubaté |
2 March 1968 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Botucatu (Factura, Itaí, Paranapanema, and Taguaí)
Diocese of Sorocaba (Barao de Antonina, Buri, Capao Bonito, Coronel Macedo, Guapiara, Itaberá, Itapeva, Itaporanga, Itararé, Ribeirão Branco, Ribeirão Vermelho do Sul, and Taquarituba) Diocese of Santos (Apiai, Barra do Turvo, Iporanga, and Ribeira) | Diocese of Itapeva (erected) |
19 January 1974 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Itapeva (Barra do Turvo and Iporanga)
Diocese of Santos (Cananeia, Eldorado Paulista, Iguape, Itariri, Jacupiranga, Juquiá, Miracatu, Pariquera-Açu, Pedro de Toledo, Registro, and Sete Barras) | Diocese of Registro (erected) |
24 March 1982 | Territory Added | Diocese of Taubaté (Caraguatatuba and Ubatuba) | Diocese of Santos |
3 March 1999 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Santos (Caraguatatuba, Iíhabela, São Sebastiâo, and Ubatuba) | Diocese of Caraguatatuba (erected) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1949 | 300,000 | 377,000 | 79.6% | 25 | 28 | 53 | 5,660 | 37 | 227 | 26 | ap1951 | |
1966 | 57 | 38 | 95 | 0 | 54 | 316 | 35 | ap1967 | ||||
1968 | 528,619 | 587,354 | 90.0% | 55 | 59 | 114 | 4,637 | 78 | 309 | 35 | ap1971 | |
1976 | 731,855 | 813,173 | 90.0% | 30 | 37 | 67 | 10,923 | 48 | 234 | 33 | ap1977 | |
1980 | 769,000 | 861,000 | 89.3% | 28 | 49 | 77 | 9,987 | 57 | 223 | 38 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 948,000 | 1,064,000 | 89.1% | 50 | 34 | 84 | 11,285 | 40 | 229 | 42 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 958,000 | 1,255,000 | 76.3% | 52 | 34 | 86 | 11,139 | 1 | 34 | 170 | 52 | ap2000 |
2000 | 970,000 | 1,273,000 | 76.2% | 46 | 34 | 80 | 12,125 | 2 | 37 | 202 | 45 | ap2001 |
2001 | 1,013,944 | 1,345,949 | 75.3% | 43 | 38 | 81 | 12,517 | 2 | 42 | 174 | 39 | ap2002 |
2002 | 1,022,095 | 1,476,820 | 69.2% | 52 | 38 | 90 | 11,356 | 14 | 42 | 260 | 41 | ap2003 |
2003 | 1,302,511 | 1,530,874 | 85.1% | 48 | 21 | 69 | 18,876 | 14 | 21 | 260 | 40 | ap2004 |
2004 | 1,310,551 | 1,530,874 | 85.6% | 42 | 28 | 70 | 18,722 | 14 | 28 | 260 | 40 | ap2005 |
2010 | 1,464,000 | 1,710,000 | 85.6% | 51 | 47 | 98 | 14,938 | 24 | 55 | 131 | 42 | ap2011 |
2014 | 1,536,000 | 1,794,000 | 85.6% | 47 | 43 | 90 | 17,066 | 26 | 52 | 115 | 48 | ap2015 |
2017 | 1,654,160 | 1,840,760 | 89.9% | 45 | 37 | 82 | 20,172 | 35 | 44 | 92 | 55 | ap2018 |
2020 | 1,692,900 | 1,883,800 | 89.9% | 47 | 36 | 83 | 20,396 | 32 | 46 | 104 | 54 | ap2021 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 31 Jul 2023 |
✠