Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Inocêncio Engelke, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1881BornJoinville
31 Jan 190725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
4 Jul 192443.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Jul 192443.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
12 Dec 192443.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
25 Dec 193554.8SucceededBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Jun 196079.3DiedBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Inocêncio Engelke:
Bishop Inocêncio Engelke O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Campanha

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,749
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013