Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carlos de Aguirre

Deceased

Bishop of Sorocaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1880BornItaqueri da Serra
8 Dec 190424.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 192444.2AppointedBishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
8 Dec 192444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
8 Jan 197392.7DiedBishop of Sorocaba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos de Aguirre:
Bishop José Carlos de Aguirre (born , died ) Bishop of Sorocaba

  • a priest for 68.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013