Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Camargo Barros

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1858BornSão Paulo
10 Sep 188224.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of São Paulo, Brazil
11 Mar 188324.9Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
16 Jan 189435.7AppointedBishop of Curitiba, Brazil
24 Jun 189436.2Ordained BishopBishop of Curitiba, Brazil
30 Sep 189436.4InstalledBishop of Curitiba, Brazil
9 Nov 190345.5AppointedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
24 Apr 190446.0InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
4 Aug 190648.3DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Camargo Barros:
Bishop José de Camargo Barros (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013