Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paulo Evaristo Cardinal Arns, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Paulo, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1921Born
10 Dec 194322.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Nov 194423.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
30 Nov 194524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 May 196644.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
2 May 196644.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Respecta
3 Jul 196644.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Respecta
22 Oct 197049.1AppointedArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
1 Nov 197049.1InstalledArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
5 Mar 197351.4Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197351.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Tuscolana
9 Apr 199876.5RetiredArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
14 Dec 201695.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Evaristo Arns (VIAF: 115125092)
Paulo Evaristo Cardinal Arns O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForquilhinha, Archdiocese of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina
Ordained PriestPetrópolis, Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy)
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Church, Forquilhinha, Diocese of Tubarão, Santa Catarina
Death PlaceSanta Catarina, Hospital, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 50.4 years
  • a cardinal for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 14 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Jun 2019

Quantcast