Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agnelo Cardinal Rossi

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1913BornJoaquím Egidio
27 Mar 193723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Campinas, Brazil
5 Mar 195642.8AppointedBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil
15 Apr 195642.9Ordained BishopBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil
6 Sep 196249.3AppointedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 Nov 196451.4AppointedArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
22 Feb 196551.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196551.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Gran Madre di Dio
22 Oct 197057.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
8 Apr 198470.9AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
25 Jun 198471.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
19 Dec 198673.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
19 Dec 198673.6ConfirmedDean of the College of Cardinals
6 Dec 198976.5RetiredPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
31 May 199380.0ResignedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
31 May 199380.0ResignedDean of the College of Cardinals
21 May 199582.0DiedPresident Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Agnelo Rossi (VIAF: 17270995)
Agnelo Cardinal Rossi (born , died ) President Emeritus of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
  • a cardinal for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Dec 2016