Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Gaspar d’Afonseca e Silva

Deceased

Archbishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1901BornAraxá
12 Aug 192322.6Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Feb 193534.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Feb 193534.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
28 Apr 193534.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
29 Jul 193938.6AppointedArchbishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Sep 193938.7InstalledArchbishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Aug 194342.6DiedArchbishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Gaspar d’Afonseca e Silva:
Archbishop José Gaspar d’Afonseca e Silva (born , died ) Archbishop of São Paulo

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013