Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Justino Carreira

Deceased

Bishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1950Born
11 Jun 197626.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Mar 197727.1Ordained PriestPriest of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Mar 200555.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
24 Mar 200555.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
21 May 200555.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
23 Nov 201161.8AppointedBishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 Sep 201363.5DiedBishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Justino Carreira
Bishop Joaquim Justino Carreira (born , died ) Bishop of Guarulhos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Catarina da Serra, Portugal

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,893
  • d: CB, 2 Sep 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018