Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerônimo Mazzarotto

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Curitiba, Parana

Titular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1898BornCuritiba
24 Apr 192123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Curitiba, Brazil
29 Apr 195759.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
29 Apr 195759.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
21 Jul 195759.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
8 May 197072.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
23 May 1999101.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jerônimo Mazzarotto:
Bishop Jerônimo Mazzarotto (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Curitiba

  • a priest for 78.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013