Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romeu Alberti

Deceased

Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1927BornSão Paulo
7 Oct 195124.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Mar 196436.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Mar 196436.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Belali
24 May 196437.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belali
22 Feb 196537.8AppointedBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
3 Jun 198255.1AppointedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
6 Aug 198861.3DiedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Romeu Alberti:
Archbishop Romeu Alberti (born , died ) Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013