Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Carlos Dias

Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

Titular Bishop of Tunes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1964 BornCaconde
28 Oct 198925.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Apr 199126.5Ordained PriestPriest of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Mar 201651.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
16 Mar 201651.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunes
7 May 201651.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunes

MicroData Summary for Luiz Carlos Dias
Bishop Luiz Carlos Dias (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Paulo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2016
  • c01/od/ob: CB, 16 Mar 2016
  • c2+: CB, 10 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 May 2016