Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Thurler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Capitolias

Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1913Born
4 Apr 194228.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 195945.6AppointedBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
5 Apr 195945.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
22 Mar 196248.7ResignedBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
22 Mar 196248.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Capitolias
22 Mar 196248.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
22 Mar 196551.7ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
1966²52.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
23 Apr 199278.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Thurler
Bishop José Thurler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chapecó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Friburgo

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast