Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Gaspar

Bishop Emeritus of Barretos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1931 BornSão Paulo
8 Jul 196230.7Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
6 Dec 198251.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
6 Dec 198251.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cozyla
6 Feb 198351.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cozyla
20 Dec 200069.1AppointedBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Mar 200169.3InstalledBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Jan 200876.2RetiredBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Gaspar:
Bishop Antônio Gaspar (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Barretos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barretos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 29 Jan 2014