Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Gonzaga Peluso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1907Born
25 Oct 193124.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 194638.9AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
18 Aug 194639.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Jul 195952.0AppointedBishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
3 Dec 198578.4RetiredBishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
7 Nov 199386.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís Gonzaga Peluso
Bishop Luís Gonzaga Peluso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBragança Paulista

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast