Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Augusto Dias Duarte

Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Titular Bishop of Tuscamia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1948 BornSanto André
15 Aug 197829.8Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
12 Jan 200556.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
12 Jan 200556.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
12 Mar 200556.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tuscamia

MicroData Summary for Antônio Augusto Dias Duarte:
Bishop Antônio Augusto Dias Duarte (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,833

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013