Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vicente Angelo José Marchetti Zioni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1911Born
11 Apr 193624.3Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
20 Apr 195543.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
20 Apr 195543.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lauzadus
29 Jun 195543.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lauzadus
25 Mar 196452.2AppointedBishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Mar 196856.2AppointedArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 May 198977.4RetiredArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Aug 200795.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vicente Angelo José Marchetti Zioni
Archbishop Vicente Angelo José Marchetti Zioni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Botucatu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo

  • a priest for 71.3 years
  • a bishop for 52.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 48
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast