Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Roberto Fortes Palau

Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

Titular Bishop of Acufida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1965 BornJacareí
6 Feb 199327.8Ordained PriestPriest of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Apr 201449.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
30 Apr 201449.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Acufida
21 Jun 201449.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acufida

MicroData Summary for José Roberto Fortes Palau:
Bishop José Roberto Fortes Palau (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Paulo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 30 Apr 2014
  • c2: CB, 14 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 4 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014