Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Celso Queiroz

Bishop Emeritus of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1933 Born
17 Apr 196026.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 197541.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
10 Oct 197541.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Saetabis
14 Dec 197542.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saetabis
9 Feb 200066.2AppointedBishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Oct 200975.9RetiredBishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Celso Queiroz (VIAF: 304918313)
Bishop Antônio Celso Queiroz (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Catanduva

EventPlace
Birth PlacePirassununga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Catanduva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast