Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of São Carlos

Dioecesis Sancti Caroli in Brasilia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luiz Carlos Dias, Bishop
  • Paulo Sérgio Machado, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 25 November 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Campinas
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sao Paulo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 13,064 (5,045 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul 1
  • Official Web Site: https://www.diocesesaocarlos.org.br
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Av. Jose Pereira Lopes 386, Vila Prado, 13574-380 Sao Carlos, SP, Brazil
  • Telephone: (016)3362-4480

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of São Carlos do Pinhal
7 June 1908ErectedDiocese of São Paulo Diocese of São Carlos do Pinhal (erected)
25 January 1929Territory LostDiocese of São Carlos do Pinhal (Jaboticabal, Barretos, Bebedouro, Pitangueiras, Viradouro, Monte Alto, Monte Azul, Tayassù, Tayuva, Olympia, Collina, Cajoby, Irupy, Piranjy, Guaracy, and Severino) Diocese of Jaboticabal (erected)
25 January 1929Territory LostDiocese of São Carlos do Pinhal (Rio Preto, Ibirá, Santa Adélia, Tabapuã, Mirassol, Nova Granada, Monte Aprazível, Tanabi, Ariranha, Catanduva, Potirendaba, Inácio Uchoa, Cedral, José Bonifácio, and Fernando Prestes) Diocese of Rio Preto (erected)
Diocese of São Carlos
25 November 1957Name ChangedDiocese of São Carlos do Pinhal Diocese of São Carlos
14 February 1958Territory LostDiocese of São Carlos (Analdnia and Corumdatai) Diocese of Piracicaba
14 February 1958Territory LostDiocese of São Carlos (St. Matthaei (in Guarida)) Diocese of Jaboticabal
14 February 1958Territory AddedDiocese of Rio Preto (Cândido Rodrigues and Vila Negri (in Taquaritinga)) Diocese of São Carlos
19 April 1958Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of São Carlos (from São Paulo)
9 February 2000Territory LostDiocese of Jaboticabal (Ariranha, Palmares Paulista, Paraíso, and Santa Adélia)
Diocese of Rio Preto (Catanduva, Catiguá, Elisário, Ibirá, Nováis, Pindorama, Tabapuá, and Urêpes)
Diocese of São Carlos (Irapua, Itajobi, Marapoama, Novo Horizonte, and Sales)
Diocese of Catanduva (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of São Carlos do Pinhal
1950579,156603,42296.0%3540757,7224516442ap1951
Diocese of São Carlos
1966470,000482,00097.5%6032925,1083023043ap1967
1970406,300470,00086.4%4423676,0643113842ap1971
1976450,000522,72486.1%4235775,8444320947ap1977
1980512,000570,00089.8%4637836,16815319146ap1981
1990749,000828,00090.5%6723908,32213115162ap1991
1999709,308895,48679.2%88311195,96014212373ap2000
2000628,000857,00073.3%90191095,76123012073ap2001
2001618,000951,07665.0%8414986,306102510569ap2002
2002703,086963,08673.0%85311166,061104010970ap2003
2003712,815985,23672.3%80261066,72410349670ap2004
2004723,371951,08676.1%85311166,23517418270ap2005
2010801,0001,097,00073.0%115251405,721364971100ap2011
2014826,0001,135,00072.8%135261615,130474295107ap2015
2017847,0001,251,70067.7%146241704,982432865124ap2018
2020866,8001,280,00067.7%162271894,586585567126ap2021
2022838,0001,237,21467.7%164231874,481564350132ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of São Carlos
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 50, Page 225, and Page 26
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 90, to Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 20 Mar 2024