Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lafayette Ferreira Álvares

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1903BornConceição do Rio Verde
15 Aug 193430.7Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Jul 196561.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Jul 196561.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Carcabia
8 Sep 196561.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carcabia
1 Feb 197167.2AppointedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Mar 197167.3InstalledBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Nov 197672.9ResignedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Mar 199793.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Lafayette Ferreira Álvares:
Bishop José Lafayette Ferreira Álvares (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança Paulista

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013