Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmar Perón

Bishop of Paranaguá, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1965 BornMaringá
23 Jul 198924.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
21 Jan 199024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
30 Dec 200944.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
30 Dec 200944.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mattiana
28 Feb 201044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mattiana
25 Nov 201550.7AppointedBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edmar Perón:
Bishop Edmar Perón (born ) Bishop of Paranaguá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paranaguá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,579
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 25 Nov 2015