Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angélico Sândalo Bernardino

Bishop Emeritus of Blumenau, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1933 Born
12 Jul 195926.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 197441.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
12 Dec 197441.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tambeae
25 Jan 197542.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tambeae
19 Apr 200067.2AppointedBishop of Blumenau, Santa Catarina, Brazil
18 Feb 200976.0RetiredBishop of Blumenau, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Angélico Sândalo Bernardino
Bishop Angélico Sândalo Bernardino (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Blumenau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaltinho de Piracicaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Blumenau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast