Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aldo de Cillo Pagotto, S.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paraíba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1949Born
7 Dec 197728.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Dec 198536.2ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
10 Sep 199747.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
31 Oct 199748.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
18 Mar 199848.5SucceededBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
5 May 200454.6AppointedArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil
6 Jul 201666.8ResignedArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil
14 Apr 202070.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paraíba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aldo de Cillo Pagotto
Archbishop Aldo de Cillo Pagotto S.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paraíba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Ordained BishopSão José, Cathedral, Fortaleza, Archdiocese of Fortaleza, Ceara
Death PlaceFortaleza, Archdiocese of Fortaleza, Ceara

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,165
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2016
  • d: CB, 14 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Apr 2020

Quantcast