Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zawisza z Kurozwęk

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Apr 1380AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
4 Apr 1380Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
12 Jan 1382DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Zawisza z Kurozwęk
Bishop Zawisza z Kurozwęk (died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Death PlaceDobrawoda, Diocese of Kraków

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 214
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 May 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast