Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jan Olbracht Cardinal Waza (Wazy), S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1612Born
21 Oct 16219.4AppointedAdministrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
19 Nov 162917.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
6 Nov 163220.4AppointedAdministrator of Kraków, Poland
20 Nov 163220.4AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
20 Dec 163220.5Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 163220.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
29 Dec 163422.5DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Olbracht Waza (Wazy)
Jan Olbracht Cardinal Waza (Wazy) S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków

  • a cardinal for 5.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 359
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018