Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Zbigniew Cardinal z Oleśnicki

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1389Born
1 Jul 142333.5AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
18 Dec 142334.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
19 Dec 142334.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
18 Dec 143950.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144050.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
1 Apr 145565.3DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Zbigniew z Oleśnicki (VIAF: 37308299)
Zbigniew Cardinal z Oleśnicki (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienno

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
  • a cardinal for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 214
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast