Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Lipski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572¹Born
20 Feb 161745.1AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
20 Nov 162351.8AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
2 Dec 163058.9AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
4 Sep 163159.6DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Lipski
Bishop Andrzej Lipski (born 1572, died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRzeplinie

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,617, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 166, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast