Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Guzdek

Bishop of Poland, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1956 BornChocznia
17 May 198125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 Aug 200448.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 Aug 200448.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Treba
15 Sep 200448.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Treba
4 Dec 201054.7AppointedBishop of Poland, Military

MicroData Summary for Józef Guzdek:
Bishop Józef Guzdek (born ) Bishop of Poland, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Poland, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,685
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Apr 2014