Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakub Zadzik

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹BornDrużbinie
1604²22.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 162442.9AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
13 Apr 162543.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
17 Sep 163553.7AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
17 Mar 164260.2DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakub Zadzik:
Bishop Jakub Zadzik (died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,933

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014