Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Jan Chojeński

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1486Born
4 Aug 153145.3AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
27 Oct 153549.6AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
17 Aug 153751.4AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
11 Mar 153851.9DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Bl. Jan Chojeński
Bishop Bl. Jan Chojeński (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGolejówku

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 276
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast