Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Piotr Gamrat

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Apostolic Administrator of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1487¹Born
29 Jan 153144.0AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
27 Oct 153548.8AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
17 Aug 153750.6AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
8 Feb 153851.1Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
29 Jul 153851.5AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
28 Jan 154154.0AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
28 May 154154.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kraków, Poland
27 Aug 154558.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr Gamrat
Archbishop Piotr Gamrat (born 1487, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSamoklęskach

  • a bishop for 7.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 180
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279, and Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast