Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Józef Radoszewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Hirina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1721³BornMichalow
25 Dec 174625.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków, Poland
27 Dec 174625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
23 Apr 178766.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
23 Apr 178766.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
26 Aug 178766.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
6 Jun 179675.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Józef Radoszewski
Bishop Wojciech Józef Radoszewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 238, and Page 454
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,787
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,658
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016