Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Pavel Woronicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1753Born
5 Sep 177017.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
20 May 178430.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
5 Jun 178430.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Dec 181562.4AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
8 May 181662.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
28 Jan 182874.5AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
6 Dec 182976.4DiedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Pavel Woronicz
Archbishop Jan Pavel Woronicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrodów

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 15
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 166, and Page 390
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,642

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast