Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Archidioecesis Varsaviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Kazimierz Nycz, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Józef Górzyński, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Piotr Jarecki, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Rafał Markowski, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Marian Duś, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 June 1818
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 3,350 (1,293 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archidiecezja.warszawa.pl/
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Metropolitalna, ul. Miodow 17-19, 00-246 Warszawa, Polska
  • Telephone: (022)531-72-00
  • Fax: 531-72-55

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Warszawa
16 October 1798ErectedDiocese of Warszawa (erected)
Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
30 June 1818ElevatedDiocese of Warszawa Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Łódź
Diocese of Płock
Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Diocese of Łowicz (erected)
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Płock
Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Diocese of Warszawa-Praga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
19501,600,0001,875,00085.3%4781796572,4355691,948278ap1951
19702,700,0003,100,00087.1%9154851,4001,9288963,529309ap1971
19803,170,3903,463,29091.5%1,0174851,5022,1101,0023,418366ap1981
19902,985,0003,110,00096.0%1,1294881,6171,8469244,560440ap1991
19991,445,0001,523,00094.9%6254091,0341,3979182,516198ap2000
20001,435,0001,525,00094.1%6363891,0251,4008302,524200ap2001
20011,435,9501,525,00094.2%6484721,1201,2829162,363203ap2002
20021,436,2251,525,00094.2%6614531,1141,2899002,378209ap2003
20031,437,4501,525,42094.2%6734331,1061,2998762,375210ap2004
20041,438,2001,533,00093.8%6744801,1541,2469292,098210ap2005
20101,426,0001,540,00092.6%7295161,2451,14518491,816210ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014