Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Lipnicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹BornSandomierz
5 Feb 164669.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
5 Feb 164669.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
22 Jul 164669.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
4 Jun 165780.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Lipnicki:
Bishop Wojciech Lipnicki (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,944
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014