Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Kot, O.M.I.

Bishop of Zé-Doca, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1962 Born
8 Sep 198624.3ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Jun 199230.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Jul 201452.2AppointedBishop of Zé-Doca, Maranhão, Brazil
18 Oct 201452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zé-Doca, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Kot
Bishop João Kot O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Zé-Doca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaków Podhalanski, Poland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zé-Doca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2014
  • bp: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 31 Jul 2014
  • c2+: CB, 26 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017