Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcin von Siemieński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1758BornRunów Krajenski
20 May 178122.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków, Poland
22 Dec 178123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
8 Mar 181657.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
8 Mar 181657.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
15 Sep 181657.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
27 Sep 183173.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marcin von Siemieński:
Bishop Marcin von Siemieński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,780
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 171
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014