Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zdzisław Stanisław Błaszczyk

Auxiliary Bishop of Sćo Sebastićo do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Aulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1969 Born
8 May 199323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 May 199424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
4 Dec 201950.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sćo Sebastićo do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
4 Dec 201950.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
25 Jan 202050.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon

MicroData Summary for Zdzisław Stanisław Błaszczyk
Bishop Zdzisław Stanisław Błaszczyk (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sćo Sebastićo do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGdów, Poland
Ordained DeaconKraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
Ordained PriestCathedral, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
Ordained BishopSćo Sebastićo, Cathedral, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of Sćo Sebastićo do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Sćo Sebastićo do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2019
  • od/c012: CB, 4 Dec 2019
  • c34: CB, 15 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast