Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grzegorz Ryś

Archbishop of Łódź, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1964 Born
22 May 198824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
16 Jul 201147.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
16 Jul 201147.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcavica
28 Sep 201147.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcavica
14 Sep 201753.5AppointedArchbishop of Łódź, Poland
4 Nov 201753.7InstalledArchbishop of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Ryś (VIAF: 85444545)
Archbishop Grzegorz Ryś (born ) Archbishop of Łódź

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Łódź.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2011
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2011
  • c34: CB, 16 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,150
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast