Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stanislaw Cardinal Hosius (Hozjusz)

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1504BornKraków
1543²38.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
12 Jul 154945.1AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
16 Mar 155045.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
2 Mar 155146.8SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
11 May 155147.0ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
17 Mar 156055.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
26 Feb 156156.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Mar 156156.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
8 Aug 156157.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
31 Aug 156258.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
4 Sep 156561.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
7 Sep 156561.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Teodoro
10 Feb 157065.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
9 Jun 157066.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
3 Jul 157066.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
8 Jan 157469.6AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
9 Jul 157874.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
3 Oct 157874.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
5 Aug 157975.2DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Hosius (Hozjusz) (VIAF: 66506400)
Stanislaw Cardinal Hosius (Hozjusz) (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
  • a cardinal for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 39, and Page 327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 182
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016