Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Antoni Ignacy Gawroński

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1740BornSzczuczyn
8 Aug 175615.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
24 Sep 176928.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
28 Oct 176928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Dec 180363.0SelectedBishop of Kraków, Poland
24 Sep 180463.8ConfirmedBishop of Kraków, Poland
25 Nov 180464.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
7 Apr 181372.4DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Antoni Ignacy Gawroński:
Bishop Andrzej Antoni Ignacy Gawroński (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013